Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Medical Hyperbarics, Inc., filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Gabbitas, Darla J, against Helmly, Reed, represented by Drake, Christian, Ghrist, Ian D, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with PURDY, MONICA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePURDY, MONICA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2020 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: July 16, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 16, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
95TH Non Jury Trial Notice Non Jury Trial L2 |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS DEFENDANT |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED COPIES OF ORDERS OF NONSUIT - DARLA J GABBITAS NOTE - CLERKS - MAILED COPIES/ORDERS OF NONSUIT/ALL PARTIES |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER - NONSUIT - COUNTERCLAIM ORDER - NONSUIT - COUNTERCLAIMS |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NONSUIT OF COUNTERCLAIMS NOTICE OF NONSUIT OF COUNTERCLAIMS |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
(PROPOSED) ORDER ON NOTICE OF NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL SECOND |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.