Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hicks, Michael Anthony, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Heald, Kristofor, against Geico County Mutual Insurance Company, Vasquez, Veronica, represented by Cramer, Daniel W, Woods, Danah L., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, KRISTINA M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND DISCOVERY REQUESTS
Plaintiff Michael Anthony Hicks complains of defendants Veronica Vasquez and GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company. Plaintiff asserts claims for negligence and uninsured motorist benefits. As reli...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 16, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 19, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (3) - ALL PARTIES |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE NONSUIT NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER NONSUIT-PLAINTIFF NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL HEARING zoom link sent |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE Motion - Strike 30 MIN ROXANNE 469-598-1900 BY ZOOM Zoom Meeting ID: 980 8110 7943 sent login 3/25 |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 04/02/21 9:30 MOTION STRIKE NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT 04/02/21 9:30 MOTION STRIKE |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 02/24/21 9:00 MOTION STRIKE Motion - Strike 30 MIN ROXANNE 469-598-1900 BY ZOOM Zoom Meeting ID: 955 9095 1014 sent login 2/16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.