Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Corner Stone Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Blalack, Chris, against Johnson, Aldon, Iv, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTOBOLOWSKY, EMILY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2020 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 16, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 16, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT JUDGMENT ALDON JOHNSON |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ISSUE ABSTRACT | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RULE 239(a) - CHRIS BLALACK NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
NO ACTIVITY LETTER Final Disposition Hearing |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE LETTER RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXCUTED CITATION ALDON JOHNSON IV RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION ALDON JOHNSON IV |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.