Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Southwest Recovery Services, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Carroll, James Brendan, Iii, against 208 E. Louisiana Ltd, Sbbt, Llc, represented by Griffith, Scott, Michaels, Joshua V, Warden, Benjamin L., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTOBOLOWSKY, EMILY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2020 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 16, 2020COUNTER CLAIM
Date: January 29, 2021Final Disposition Hearing
Date: October 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
30 DAY LETTER Final Disposition Hearing (SETTLED * LETTER 8-10-23) |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COPY ORDER TO PARTIES |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
SETTLEMENT LETTER SETTLED LETTER |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFT'S MOTION RECONSIDERATION Motion - Partial Summary Judgment SET FOR 1 HOUR DEFT'S TRAD & NO-EVID P/SJ AND M/RECONSIDER JOSHUA MICHAELS 512 718-3388 **IN PERSON** |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - RECONSIDER GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.