Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hodge, Sherri, filed a(n) Property case represented by Alexander, Joshua W, Alexander, Josh W, against Big Lots Stores, Inc., represented by Mayer, Zach T, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with PURDY, MONICA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePURDY, MONICA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2020 |
CategoryProperty |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Sherri Hodge against Big Lots Stores, Inc. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of Big Lots Stores, Inc. and seeks damages for injuries suffered by Sherri Hodge. The complaint states that on July 13...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 16, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: December 21, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 10, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 16, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 24, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 24, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 09, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 24, 2021TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: December 21, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 25, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 24, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 12, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 12, 2021Final Disposition Hearing
Date: May 13, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: June 02, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: December 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 06, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 24, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 24, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 12, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Date: April 08, 2021NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: April 12, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 25, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 08, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 08, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 08, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 24, 2021MOTION - DISMISS
Date: May 24, 2021ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: June 02, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: May 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
95TH JURY TRIAL NOTICE I Jury Trial - Civil L3 |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED AGREED DISMISSAL TO ZACH MAYER NOTE - CLERKS MAILED ORDER TO ALL PARTIES |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (AGREED) ORDER - DISMISSAL AGREED |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER TO DISMISS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED AGREED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO PLAINTIFF/DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
95th Dispo Notice Settled II Final Disposition Hearing |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERT DEPO UPTOWN RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES PERTAINING TO SHERRY VERLYNN HODGE CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION UPTOWN RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES PERTAINING TO SHERRY VERLYNN HODGE |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERT DEPO UPTOWN RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES - BILLING PERTAINING TO SHERRY VERLYNN HODGE CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION UPTOWN RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES - BILLING PERTAINING TO SHERRY VERLYNN HODGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.