Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Newrez, Llc, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Emert, Jonathan Coe, Hernandez-Vivoni, Carlos R, against All Occupants Of Property, Lyle, George A, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTOBOLOWSKY, EMILY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2020 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 15, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 25, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 19, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 29, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: January 19, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: January 19, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 15, 2020REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: October 15, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: October 15, 2020MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: April 22, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 22, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 13, 2021CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS
Date: April 22, 2021Final Disposition Hearing
Date: March 01, 2021Final Disposition Hearing
Date: May 17, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2021Motion - Default Judgment
Date: June 18, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: August 12, 2021ISSUE WRIT
Date: August 05, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: July 06, 2021NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: June 21, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 05, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: August 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
UNEXEUTED WRIT OF POSSESSION: GEORGE LYLE RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION GEORGE LYLE |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
COPY FEE FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION JUDGMENT REQUEST FOR SERVICE |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION - GEORGE LYLE ISSUE WRIT SIGN AND SEAL |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE LETTER CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
SIGN AND SEAL WRIT REQUEST FOR SERVICE |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL - JUDGMENT NOTICE - GEORGE A LYLE RETURNED MAIL JUDGMENT NOTICE - GEORGE A LYLE |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RULE 239(a) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT Motion - Default Judgment SET BY TERRI MALONE 850-422-2520, |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT ON MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.