Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barcuch, Tahana, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mays, Forrest, Said, Rabia, against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, Defalco, Jody, Monroe, Eugene, Ii, Monroe, Jo Ann, represented by Worthington, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITMORE, BRIDGETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the District Court of Dallas County, Texas. The plaintiffs, Tahana Barcuch and C.S., a minor, are filing a lawsuit against defendants Eugene Monroe II and Jo Ann Monroe. The lawsuit arises from a motor vehi...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 15, 2020MOTION - GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: December 14, 2020JURY DEMAND
Date: July 15, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore Jury Trial - Civil |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore Jury Trial - Civil |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
2ND MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE MOTION - CONTINUANCE 2ND |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON 2ND CONTINUANCE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER ON 2ND CONTINUANCE |
|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD MISCELLANOUS EVENT |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
4TH SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF SRVICE AND FILING RECORD AFFIDAVITS AFFIDAVIT 4TH SUPPLEMENTAL |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore Jury Trial - Civil |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
2ND AMENDED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER W JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED 2ND AMENDED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER W JURY TRIAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT 2ND AMENDED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER W JURY TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.