Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Halton, Jaylon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rolle, Larry, against Ramirez, Penelope J., represented by Meyer, Sara Bonau, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 191st District Court with SLAUGHTER, GENA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSLAUGHTER, GENA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House191st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 15, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: September 03, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
1 9 1 COVER SHEET Jury Trial - Civil |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COPY TO PLT AND DEF |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGRD ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
UNITED STATES AUTOMOBILE CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRETRIAL JURY |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
MEDICAL CHARGES FROM MOMENTUM SPINE AND JOINT AFFIDAVIT |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
MEDICAL CHARGES FROM PEOPLE FIRST PHARMACY AFFIDAVIT |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
MEDICAL RECORDS FROM PREMIER INJURY CLINICS OF DFW AFFIDAVIT |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
MEDICAL RECORDS FROM MOMENTUM SPINE AND JOINT AFFIDAVIT |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
MEDICAL CHARGES FROM MRI CENTERS OF TEXAS AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.