Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Amin, Allen I, against Sneed, Corey, represented by Clark, Robert M, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with GOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 07, 2020 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 07, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 30, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COPY TO PLT AND DEF |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER RE NONSUIT CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SETTING (NON JURY) RESET FROM 1/4/21 WHEN JUDGE PRUITT WAS SITTING |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non Jury Trial P OBJECTED TO JUDGE PRUITT, D OK WITH JUDGE MURPHY |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRIAL | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non Jury Trial TWO HOURS PER D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.