Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Velasco, Karen, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gandara, Cassandra M., against Gonzalez, Maria Blanca, Wang, Xiaohan, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 20, 2020NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: April 02, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: July 27, 2020NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: June 18, 2020NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 29, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: November 30, 2020NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: June 18, 2020NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: April 02, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 20, 2020NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: August 19, 2020NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 22, 2020NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: December 07, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: January 08, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 09, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: January 08, 2021MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: September 16, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 16, 2020ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: March 20, 2020NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: January 21, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY AND TO DEFENDANTS' |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
134thDWOP-Rule 165A Letter DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION default or dismiss, if no answer |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
134th Order - DWOP DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION default or dismiss, if no answer (HOLD 1 WEEK) |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
134th Order - DWOP DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF CITATION Xiaohan Wang RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION W ORDER - SUBSTITUTED SERVICE | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE XIAOHAN WANG |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF-MOTION FOR SUBSTUTITE SERVICE MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE XIAOHAN WANG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.