Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bones, Briana, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Coward, Nicholas J., Odetunde, Adewale, against Perry, Tina, represented by Rhima, Stephanie, Kassabian, David, Weatherford, Bret W, Dorsey, Tabor J.G, Mathis, Gabrielle Morales, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 16, 2019AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 05, 2020NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: December 18, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: January 21, 2020Jury Trial - Civil
Date: January 18, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 10, 2020NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: December 18, 2019RESPONSE
Date: July 29, 2020Motion - Strike
Date: August 03, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 16, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: January 21, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 10, 2020RESPONSE
Date: September 21, 2020Jury Trial - Civil
Date: January 18, 2021Motion - Quash
Date: September 28, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 05, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 21, 2020MOTION - QUASH
Date: September 11, 2020MOTION - STRIKE
Date: June 25, 2020MOTION - QUASH
Date: August 21, 2020ORDER - STRIKE
Date: September 03, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 29, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 25, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 11, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 21, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 11, 2020Jury Trial - Civil
Date: January 19, 2021Motion - Quash
Date: September 28, 2020ORDER - DENY
Date: January 16, 2021ORDER - STRIKE
Date: January 16, 2021CASE NOT SETTLED AT MEDIATION
Date: February 15, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 12, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 03, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: June 07, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 18, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: July 19, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 30, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 17, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: March 26, 2020JURY DEMAND
Date: December 16, 2019VACATION LETTER
Date: February 25, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: December 16, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 26, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: March 26, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: March 26, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: March 26, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: March 26, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 26, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: January 21, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: May 07, 2020RULE 11
Date: February 05, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 24, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 23, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: September 09, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 05, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 05, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: September 13, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 09, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: May 24, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 31, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 31, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: August 21, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 02, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 31, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 28, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 22, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 02, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: December 15, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 04, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 02, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 29, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: February 02, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: January 19, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: April 11, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 09, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: June 18, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: April 22, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 01, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 01, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 29, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: March 01, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 01, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: March 01, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: February 18, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: July 29, 2021DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: January 31, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: October 06, 2021DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: October 20, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: December 22, 2021DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 14, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 01, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: May 16, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 12, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 10, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: July 11, 2022DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 05, 2022ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: June 14, 2022MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: June 10, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 27, 2022OBJECTION
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: July 07, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: July 07, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: July 07, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: July 07, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: January 31, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: September 28, 2021ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: October 05, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 28, 2021Motion - Quash
Date: March 22, 2021Motion - Quash
Date: March 22, 2021RESPONSE
Date: March 16, 2021MOTION - QUASH
Date: February 04, 2021Motion - Strike
Date: January 04, 2021MOTION - STRIKE
Date: December 11, 2020Motion - Strike
Date: January 04, 2021DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 05, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: August 08, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: September 07, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: September 12, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 12, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: September 27, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: October 18, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 14, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 14, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 29, 2022FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING
Date: December 05, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: October 18, 2022MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: November 29, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: October 18, 2022Final Disposition Hearing
Date: January 20, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: January 03, 2023NOTE - CLERKS
Date: December 29, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 05, 2022ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: December 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
134th Disposition Fridays Setting Final Disposition Hearing |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil Both ready 2-3 day, 5-6 wits |
|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED NOTE - CLERKS |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED AGREED OF DISMISSAL |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING NOTICE | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER RE: CASE SETTLED CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: CASE SETTLED |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.