Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hooper, Terri Lynn, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Humphreys, Mark, against Wells Asset Management Inc, represented by Apostle, James N, Mckool, Matt, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with MOORE, MARICELA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOORE, MARICELA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2019 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORDER - NONSUIT
Date: January 09, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 10, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
162nd Jury Trial Reset Letter Jury Trial - Civil |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL HEARING | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEF/6TH SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST SIXTH SUPPLEMENTAL |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEF/5TH SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST DEF/5TH SUPPLEMENTAL |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
162nd Jury Trial Reset Letter Jury Trial - Civil |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEF/ 4TH SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT LIST Defendant's Fourth Supplemental Exhibit List |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEF/ 4TH SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST DEF/4TH SUPPLEMENTAL |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEF/PROPOSED JURY CHARGE PROPOSED JURY CHARGE DEF |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEF/ 4TH SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT LIST DEF/ FOURTH SUPPLEMENTAL |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.