Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Guerra, Pedro L., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bowen, Malik, Hendrix, Thomas, Mutong, Constance B, against Anderson, Anika, Rogers, Mark E., represented by Jenkins, Monika D, Rosenberg, Alan J., Meyer, Sara Bonau, Godoy, Jon A., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 04, 2020REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: October 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
134th Disposition Fridays Setting Final Disposition Hearing |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cover Sheet (General) NOTE - CLERKS ORDERS DISMISSAL TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
AGREED DISMISSAL AS TO ANIKA ANDERSON ORDER - DISMISSAL AS TO ANIKA ANDERSON |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED DISMISSAL AS TO ANIKA ANDERSON NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED DISMISSAL AS TO ANIKA ANDERSON |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Number Final Disposition Hearing |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil All ready, 1-2 day, 3-4 wits |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.