Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Larson, Paul S., filed a(n) Property case represented by Messina, Theodore "Joe", Iii, against Acg Texas General Partnership, Llc, Acg Texas Holdings, Llc, Acg Texas Restaurants, Llc, Acg Texas Restaurants, Lp, represented by Kim, Eugene Y, Perez, Damian, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with FRAZIER, VERETTA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRAZIER, VERETTA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 03, 2019 |
CategoryProperty |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House44th District Court |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 01, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 15, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 03, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR P OBJECTS TO JUDGE O'NEILL |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED COPY ORDER TO EUGENE Y KIM NOTE - CLERKS COPY ORDER TO ALL PARTIES |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL ACG TEXAS HOLDING,LLC,ACG TEXAS RESTAURANTS,LP, AND ACG TEXXAS GENERAL PARTNERSHIP,LLC |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER DISMISSAL |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
JOINT MOTION DISMISSAL MOTION - DISMISS JOINT |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SETTING (JURY) LEVEL 3, P TRIPPED ON CONCRETE |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER RE: SETTLED AT MEDIATION CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: SETTLED AT MEDIATION |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFS NO EVID MSJ Motion - Summary Judgment **BY SUBMISSION** D/NO EVID MSJ - EUGENE 972 536 1480 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.