Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jackson, Landerish, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Eaton, Chad W., Rolle, Larry, Rolle, Lawrence F, against Salazar, Jose Guevara, represented by Ellis, Keith R, Kim, Sophia, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 28, 2019NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: July 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 14, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Number Final Disposition Hearing |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Number MOTION - DISMISS MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Number NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Number CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE REQUEST EXTENSION |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS E-MAILED ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT TO TRUST |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Number ORDER - MISC. APPROVE SETTLEMENT |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Number NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT SECOND AMENDED PROPOSED ORDER TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT WITHOUT GUARDIAN AD LITEM |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Number MOTION - MISCELLANOUS SECOND AMENDED AGREED MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT OF MINOR WITHOUT A PROVE-UP HEARING OR APPOINTMENT OF A GUARDIAN AD LITEM |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Number CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: AMENDED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS AGREED MOTION TO APPROVE MINOR SETTLEMENT WITHOUT AD LITEM |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Number FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.