Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bowling, Kerry, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Davis, Chad, Hindman, Michael, against Torres, Leodan Gonzalez, represented by Keramidas, T. Cass, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with WYSOCKI, ASHLEY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWYSOCKI, ASHLEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 21, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 22, 2019ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF
Date: October 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SETTING (JURY) CASE HAS MEDIATED |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SETTING (JURY) CASE HAS MEDIATED |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRIAL | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRIAL | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SETTING (JURY) CASE HAS MEDIATED |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF LEAD CNSL DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.