Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jackson, A.B., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kohm, David S, against Hooker, Lameesha, represented by Castillo, Edward E., Reily, Read H, Rosales, George, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with FRAZIER, VERETTA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRAZIER, VERETTA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2018 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
MOTION HEARING
Date: October 17, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 08, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SETTING (JURY) ONE DAY, PER P, CASE HAS MEDIATED |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION - IN LIMINE |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON LIMINE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST PLAINTIFF'S |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED JURY CHARGE | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFF'S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.