Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Rodriguez, Estella, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brown, Scott Alan, Green-French, Amanda M, Knotts, Landon Blake, against Blanco, Erica, represented by Spears, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with FRAZIER, VERETTA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRAZIER, VERETTA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2018 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 22, 2020ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF
Date: August 28, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 10, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR JUDGMENT SUBMITTED IS DEFICIENT, EMAILED PARTIES 9/12 |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER RE: PROPOSED TAKE NOTHING JUDGMENT CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: PROPOSED TAKE NOTHING JUDGMENT |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED TAKE NOTHING JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CHARGE OF COURT | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | JURY LIST | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | JURY SWORN PANEL (OCA) | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | VOIR DIRE | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SETTING (JURY) MEDIATED 11/13/19 |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.