Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Irwin, Robert J., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Maxwell, Stephen C, Sullivan, Daniel P, against Microwave Transmission Systems Inc, Richard, Mark Anthony, represented by Balido, Carlos A, Booker, Amber W, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with MOORE, MARICELA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOORE, MARICELA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: August 23, 2017DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: April 25, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
162nd Notice of Intent to Dismiss Final Disposition Hearing SETTLED |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cover Sheet (General) NOTE - CLERKS COPY ALL |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR O/DISMISS TO JUDGE'S QUEUE |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER RE: ORDER AGREED DSIMISSAL CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE COVER LETTER RE: ORDER AGREED DISMISSAL |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER AGREED DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
162nd Jury Trial Reset Letter Jury Trial - Civil 3 - 4 DAYS |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED JURY CHARGE/3RD AMENDED-PLAINTIFF PROPOSED JURY CHARGE 3RD AMENDED-PLAINTIFF |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - MEDIATION | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFFERAL TO MEDIATION NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
1ST AMENDED RULE 166 RULE 166 1ST AMENDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.