Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pinnacle Propane, Llc, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Bowdich, John W, against Fletcher, Donna, Fletcher, James Gary, Fletcher, Jay, Fletcher, Kim, Twelve Corners Farm, Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Clark, Robert M, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHOFFMAN, MARTIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 23, 2015CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 10, 2015CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 10, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Non Jury Trial |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
06-10-15 Ltr to ct re Dismissal CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
NON - SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGENT CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE AGREED DISMISSAL |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL SUBMITTED |
|
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION no svc |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
FLETCHER, KIM - CITATION RETURN OF SERVICE KIM FLETCHER DBA TWELVE CORNERS FARM |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
FLETCHER, JAMES GARY - CITATION RETURN OF SERVICE JAMES GARY FLETCHER AKA GARY JAMES FLETCHER DBA TWELVE CORNERS FARM |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
FLETCHER, DONNA - CITATION RETURN OF SERVICE DONNA FLETCHER DBA TWELVE CORNERS FARM |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
FLETCHER, JAY - CITATION RETURN OF SERVICE JAY FLETCHER INDIVIDUALLY & DBA TWELVE CORNERS FARM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.