Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Burch, Martha, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Showalter, Jesse R, against Maahiyaa Hotel, Llc, represented by Mcclain, Dan D, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 191st District Court with SLAUGHTER, GENA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSLAUGHTER, GENA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House191st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 22, 2015MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 18, 2015ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 31, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Jury Trial - Civil MEDIATE ON OR BEFORE 8/15/16 |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Martha Burch v. Maahiyaa Hotel, LLC dba DFW Airport Hotel.pd CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION Texas Health Resources (Medical Records) |
|
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Burch Dismissal Order NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT dismissal order MOVED ADMIN Q |
|
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
205316 Anup Pradhan - Signed Errata Sheet CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION ANUPAM PRADHAN, M.D. |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
DC-14-15087 - MARTHA BURCH vs. MAAHIYAA HOTEL, LLC Mediation SETTLED Letter Regarding Mediation |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
208421 ANUP PHADHAND, M.D. - OFFICER RETURn RETURN OF SERVICE OFFICER'S RETURN- ANUP PRADHAND M D |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
208420 Marc S. Goldman, M.D. - Officer Return RETURN OF SERVICE OFFICER'S RETURN- MARC S GOLDMAN M D |
|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
194752 Martha Burch - Signed Errata Sheet CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION ORAL DEPOSITION OF MARTHA BURCH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.