Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Clear Vision Windshield Repair Llc, Henderson, Shareta, Mendez, Salvador, Rocha, Yasmin, Thompson, Lafonda, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Gray, Jay K, against State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Hachenburg, Barbara L, Rogers, Scott L., Thompson, Rhonda, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with GOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryInsurance |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 17, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 05, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 01, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - NONSUIT (STATE FARM COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY) |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS FORWARD ORDER - NONSUIT TO ADMIN QUEUE |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
PropOrderNoticeNonSuit NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER - NONSUIT |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
NoticeNonSuit NOTICE OF NONSUIT W/OUT PREJUDICE |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter for Proposed Order on Nonsuit CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: FILING ORDER - NONSUIT |
|
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
CLEARVISION-Second Motion for Continuance MOTION - CONTINUANCE 2ND AGREED OF TRIAL & PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
CLEARVISION-Agreed Order for Continuance NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED ORDER - CONTINUANCE |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS FORWARD AGREED ORDER - CONTINUANCE TO ADMIN QUEUE |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS ORDER SUMMARY JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO ADMIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.