Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Jensen, Dale D, against One 2009 Jeep Liberty, Velasquez, Eduardo, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with GOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategorySeizure/Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 25, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 24, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 20, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS - FINANCIALS | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion - Default Judgment By Submission |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
VELASQUEZ ORDER NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Status Conference JUDGE TOLD P ABOUT PROBLEMS W/DEFAULT AT 3/20/15 HRG. |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS FINAL JUDGMENT FORFEITURE SUBMITTED |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
VELASQUEZ AMENDED SERVICE RTN MISCELLANOUS EVENT AMENDED SERVICE RETURN |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
VELASQUEZ CORRESPONDENCE CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
VELASQUEZ MTN TO RECONSIDER MOTION - RECONSIDER PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Status Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.