Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jones, Leroy, Jones, Vickie, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Smith, Dawn M., against Ashford Hall, Ashford Hall, Inc. D B A Ashford Hall, Lion Health Services, Inc, represented by Horne, Chastiti, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTOBOLOWSKY, EMILY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - NEW TRIAL
Date: September 30, 2016MOTION - DISMISS
Date: August 03, 2015ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 23, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 05, 2016Motion - Dismiss
Date: March 18, 2016CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 17, 2018RESPONSE
Date: June 15, 2016MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 14, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 03, 2015ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 31, 2014RESPONSE
Date: March 15, 2016MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: December 04, 2015RESPONSE
Date: November 08, 2016Motion - New Trial
Date: November 09, 2016NOTICE OF APPEAL - CT. OF APPEALS
Date: November 29, 2016Motion - Dismiss
Date: May 06, 2016NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 09, 2016NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 15, 2016CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 09, 2016Motion - Dismiss
Date: November 06, 2015RESPONSE
Date: November 04, 2015Final Disposition Hearing
Date: December 16, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 10, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 09, 2016MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 05, 2016NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 09, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 15, 2016MOTION - DISMISS
Date: December 28, 2015CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 22, 2018Final Disposition Hearing
Date: February 03, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: May 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
30 DAY LETTER Final Disposition Hearing (SETTLED * LETTER 11-15-19) |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
30 DAY LETTER Final Disposition Hearing (SETTLED * LETTER 11-15-19) |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil |
|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | SETTLED | |
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jones. AmendedPet.8.7.19 AMENDED PETITION FIRST |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jones Order on MFC NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER CONTINUANCE |
|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jones Agreed Motion for Continuance MOTION - CONTINUANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.