Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Manaloor, Abraham, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Martens, Dan, Roth, Eliot L, against Anyanwu, Don Iboro, represented by Onyenah, Kenneth C, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOYE', ERIC Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House14th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 03, 2015MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: June 03, 2015MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: January 27, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY | |
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion - Withdraw 5 MIN LILA 972/335-388 CC REQ ***TELEPHONE DOCKET*** |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Re Motion to Withdraw NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER ON MOTION WITHDRAW |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to withdraw MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS ORDER ON MOTION WITHDRAW SUBMITTED |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
FileName ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION HEARING AMENDED M/REMOVE LIEN - SET BY LILA 972-335-3888 |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS - FINANCIALS | |
February 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
2015_02_16_18_03_23 ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
February 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
2015_02_16_18_03_23 COUNTER CLAIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.