Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Propel Financial Services, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Countryman, Matthew J, against Conseco Finance Servicing Corp., Ervin, Betty Jean, Ervin, Rex, Occupant, represented by Swanson, Timothy J, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOYE', ERIC Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryOther Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House14th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: January 26, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 13, 2018ORDER - DISBURSE FUNDS
Date: March 01, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | TRUST RECEIPT | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISBURSE FUNDS WITHDRAW FUNDS FROM THE REGISTRY OF COUURT |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
1005478_AGREED ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW FUNDS_ERVIN NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED/WITHDRAW FUNDS |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
1005478_CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE_ERVIN CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE PLTF |
|
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
1005478_MOTION TO WITHDRAW FUNDS_ERVIN MOTION - DISBURSE FUNDS MOTION TO WITHDRAW FUNDS FROM THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT |
|
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | TRUST RECEIPT | |
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - MISC. AUTHORIZING DEPOSIT OF EXCESS PROCEEDS FROM FORECLOSURE |
|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Deposit Excess Proceeds.Ervin.S040717 MOTION - MISCELLANOUS DEPOSIT/EXCESS/PROCEEDS/REGISTRY |
|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for Deposit of Excess Proceeds.Ervin.S040717 NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT DEPOSIT/EXCESS/PROCEEDS/REGISTRY |
|
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.