Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Martinez, Javier, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Fitts, Bryant A., against Ornelas, Zach, Qbe Insurance, represented by Lonergan, Todd M, Martin, Christopher W, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTOBOLOWSKY, EMILY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - DISMISS
Date: November 02, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 02, 2015ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 21, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Final Disposition Hearing (SETTLED * LETTER 10-14-15) |
|
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (01456770x9F588) MOTION - DISMISS W/PREJUDICE |
|
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Granting Nonsuit (01456771x9F588) NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER - DISMISS W/PREJUDICE |
|
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS FORWARD AGREED ORDER - DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE TO ADMIN QUEUE |
|
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Jury Trial - Civil |
|
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ltr. to Ct. Martinez v QBE SETTLED PRIOR TO MEDIATION Letter to Court |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER - MEDIATION | |
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
QBE Insurance Corporation Answer ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event | JURY DEMAND | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Martinez POP, RFD, Roggs and RFP 12.30.14 ORIGINAL PETITION Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.