Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Araj, Faris, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Nolan, Patricia A, against Boynton, Ashley, Boynton, John, represented by Dowis, Craig L, O'Dens, David M, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 02, 2015MOTION - DISMISS
Date: October 20, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 20, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Non Jury Trial Initial Trial Setting (Level 2) |
|
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR AGRD ORDER DISM SIGNED 10-27-2015. ORIG/CLERK |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR AGRD ORDER DISM SUBMTITED TO JUDGE |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing | |
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/DISMISSAL SUBMITTED TO ADMIN |
|
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion_to_Dismiss MOTION - DISMISS Motion to Dismiss |
|
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
proposed_Order_re_motion_to_dismiss NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT Proposed Order-Dismissal |
|
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Parker-1 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE Mediator Correspondence to the Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.