Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tamborello, Sam C, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case against St Paul University Hospital, Ut Southwestern Medical Center, Zale Lipshy University Hospital, represented by Bitter, Adam N, Fountain, Laura, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOYE', ERIC Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House14th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 13, 2015NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: January 26, 2015RESPONSE
Date: March 24, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion - Summary Judgment AND INJUNCTION |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion - Dismiss SET BY IDA - 512-475-2011 |
|
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ON PERMANENT PROSPECTIVE INJUNCTION RELIEF |
|
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
AMENDED PETITION 1ST |
|
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: FIRST AMENDED PETITION |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack o RESPONSE DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION |
|
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE; MEDIATION ISSUE |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURSIDICTION |
|
March 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter to Judge Moye CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE LTR TO JUDGE RE:SELECTION OF MEDIATOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.