Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lexis Nexis, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mccarthy, Ian A., against Jerome Neal Stein P.C., Stein, Jerome Neal, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., represented by Pearson, James Haralson, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with SMITH, CRAIG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMITH, CRAIG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2014 |
CategoryGarnishment After Jgmt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: March 27, 2014NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 31, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
RELEASE JUDGMENT LIENS RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Garnishment NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT - JUDGE QUE |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SENT VIA EMAIL/FAX ADMIN, JURY TRIAL |
|
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRETRIAL | |
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER - MEDIATION | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL | |
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SLA ESERVE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.