Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Protection One Alarm Monitoring Inc, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Evans, Timothy L, against Purcell, Mark, represented by Johnson, Jacqueline, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PRIDDY, BRUCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePRIDDY, BRUCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2010 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 31, 2010MOTION - DISMISS
Date: May 10, 2011ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 07, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR ORDER OF DISM SIGNED 5-11-2011. ORIG/CLERK |
|
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
5-10-2011 - Motion - Dismiss CV - DC1016829 - 4102511 MOTION - DISMISS E-FILED |
|
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS Order Dismiss submitted to Judge |
|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
2-7-2011 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1016829 - 3279011 ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL E-FILED |
|
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
01-24-2011 - Rule 11 CV - DC1016829 - 3193939 RULE 11 NOTICE OF FILING |
|
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-31-2010 - Original Petition (OCA) CV - DC1016829 - 3066384 ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) |
|
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION | |
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
CITATION ATTY |
|
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-31-2010 - Case Filing Cover Sheet CV - DC1016829 - 3066387 CASE FILING COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.