Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Jensen, Dale D, against Dewberry, Ashley, One Thousand Three Hundred Thirty-Six Dollars And Sixty-Five Cents In United Sta, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with RAGGIO, LORRAINE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRAGGIO, LORRAINE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2010 |
CategorySeizure/Forfeiture - State Agency |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 31, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS - FINANCIALS | |
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/FORFEITURE TO ADMIN |
|
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
02-03-2011 - Motion - Default Judgment CV - DC1016823 - 3271714 MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
CITATION ATTY |
|
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-31-2010 - Original Petition (OCA) CV - DC1016823 - 3059098 ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) E-FILED |
|
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.