Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Jensen, Dale D, against One Thousand Six Hundred Thirty-Seven Dollars In United States Currency, Samuels, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with MOLBERG, KEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOLBERG, KEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2010 |
CategorySeizure/Forfeiture - State Agency |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 31, 2010MOTION - NEW TRIAL
Date: March 02, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS - FINANCIALS | |
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT RETURNED MAIL |
|
March 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR To Clerk: Agreed Final Judgment of Forfeiture - signed 3/5/2011 |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
03-02-2011 - Motion - New Trial CV - DC1016819 - 3478843 MOTION - NEW TRIAL |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR To Clerk: Final Judgment of Forfeiture - signed 2/6/2011 - CLOSE |
|
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
02-03-2011 - Motion - Default Judgment CV - DC1016819 - 3255608 MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
CITATION ATTY |
|
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-31-2010 - Original Petition (OCA) CV - DC1016819 - 3058717 ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) E-FILED |
|
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.