Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Leo, Edward J, Leo, Karen N, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Poblenz, Michelle, against Citimortgage Inc, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with JORDAN, JIM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJORDAN, JIM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2010 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedJuly 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 31, 2010MOTION - DISMISS
Date: April 26, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Order on Pltf's Motion to Dismiss signed 4/27/12 |
|
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/DISMISS MAILED TO ALL ATTY(S) OF RECORDS |
|
April 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
04-26-2012 - Motion - Dismiss CV - DC1016818 - 8306197 MOTION - DISMISS |
|
April 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/DISMISS - SUBMITTED TO JUDGE |
|
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | BOND FILED | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Temporary Injunction JUDGE LOWY HEARD TRO |
|
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-31-2010 - Original Petition (OCA) CV - DC1016818 - 3066440 ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.