Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Oldham Lumber Co Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Reinhardt, Lindsey L, Underkofler, Paul B, against Brasha Builders Inc, represented by Ruschman, Richard C, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2010 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
01-28-2011 - Miscellaneous Event CV - DC1016815 - 3231449 MISCELLANOUS EVENT STATUS REPORT |
|
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE | |
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | MISCELLANOUS EVENT | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT PAYMENT RECEIPT |
|
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE | |
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) 14 INST FROM DENTON COUNTY TEXAS |
|
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS - SENT BILLING LETTER FOR INCOMING TRANSFER FROM DENTON CO., $247.00 |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.