Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Strickland, Todd D, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Jones, David Stanley, against Fedex Ground Package System Inc, represented by Dabdoub, Alan, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with GINSBERG, CARL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGINSBERG, CARL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2007 |
CategoryEmployment |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 24, 2011CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 27, 2011ORDER - LIMINE
Date: February 06, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
April 22, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS ***MAILED PARTIES SIGNED CLOSE CASE ORDER*** |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
02-17-2011 - Notice of Removal to Federal Court CV - DC1016795 - 3355347 NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT SUBMIT TO JUDGE/NOT/REMOVAL |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
01-27-2011 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1016795 - 3247193 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE MEDIATOR INFORMATION |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
01-27-2011 - Order - Mediation - DC Civ M - DC1016795 - 348 - 3247303 ORDER - MEDIATION |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
01-26-2011 - Scheduling Order - DC Civ M - DC1016795 - 347 - 3247302 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
01-24-2011 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1016795 - 3247192 ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
CITATION 1/12/11 MAILED |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.