Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Reid, Stephanie K, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lafitte, Lucas S, against Huddleston, Jerry L, represented by Johnson, Stephen W, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with JORDAN, JIM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJORDAN, JIM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJuly 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 30, 2010ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 28, 2011CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 06, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil Letter from Mediator announcing settlement received 9/29/11 |
|
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
10-06-2011 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1016771 - 5660959 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE ORD DISMISSAL |
|
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
09-29-2011 - Settled - DC Civ P - DC1016771 - 5563858 SETTLED |
|
August 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
08-18-2011 - Rule 11 CV - DC1016771 - 5079268 RULE 11 |
|
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
07-01-2011 - Affidavit CV - DC1016771 - 4610824 AFFIDAVIT |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
06-30-2011 - Rule 11 CV - DC1016771 - 4595545 RULE 11 |
|
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Notice Regarding Alternative Dispute Resolution- COPY ALL PARTIES |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL 1st |
|
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
01-28-2011 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1016771 - 3252198 ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.