Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Gonzalez, Humberto, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Drew, Kendall, against Benavides, Oscar, represented by Clark, Robert M, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with SMITH, CRAIG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMITH, CRAIG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This is a complaint for damages arising from an automobile accident involving two vehicles, one driven by plaintiff and one driven by defendant. Plaintiff is suing for damages arising from personal injuries sustained in the accident, as well as econo...
ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: August 24, 2011MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 01, 2012MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: April 27, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COPY ALL |
|
July 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
07-18-2012 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1016769 - 9462113 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE N/TRIAL |
|
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
05-07-2012 - Order - Withdraw Attorney - DC Civ M - DC1016769 - 295 - 8420079 ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS TO ADM O/WD CNSL |
|
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
04-27-2012 - Motion - Withdraw Attorney CV - DC1016769 - 8307464 MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY |
|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
03-14-2012 - Order - Pretrial - DC Civ M - DC1016769 - 1116 - 7694054 ORDER - PRETRIAL |
|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
03-14-2012 - Order - Granting Continuance - DC Civ M - DC1016769 - 1139 - 7694077 ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE |
|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion - Continuance 15 MINS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.