Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Shpitsek, Alla, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hulse, Valerie, against Weinmann, Jeanne, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with MOLBERG, KEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOLBERG, KEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - DISMISS
Date: February 23, 2011ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 29, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR To Clerk: Order of Dismissal with Prejudice - signed 2/24/2011 - close |
|
February 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
02-23-2011 - Motion - Dismiss CV - DC1016713 - 3408050 MOTION - DISMISS |
|
February 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Set for dismissal 3/3/2011. Notice sent to counsel. |
|
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | CITATION | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | CITATION | |
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION | |
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-29-2010 - Original Petition (OCA) CV - DC1016713 - 3044138 ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) E-FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.