Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Joystix Inc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Scott, James C, against Kennedy Holdings I Llc, Kennedy, Jason, represented by Kilpatrick, Brian Allan, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with RAGGIO, LORRAINE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRAGGIO, LORRAINE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCommercial Dispute |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 16, 2010RESPONSE
Date: November 19, 2010MOTION - LEAVE
Date: November 19, 2010MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 24, 2010ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 15, 2010ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 31, 2009MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 16, 2010CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 15, 2010ORDER - DENY
Date: December 16, 2010RESPONSE
Date: December 06, 2010OBJECTION
Date: December 01, 2010MOTION - LEAVE
Date: November 22, 2010MOTION - LEAVE
Date: October 11, 2010OBJECTION
Date: January 28, 2011MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 22, 2010AMENDED PETITION
Date: October 11, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Hearing Submission/Settled |
|
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/NONSUIT TO ADMIN |
|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
4-5-2011 - Notice of NonSuit CV - DC0917514 - 3773129 NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil Per Both Cnsl |
|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
02-07-2011 - Return of Service CV - DC0917514 - 3290065 RETURN OF SERVICE 1 ATTY SUBP ISSUEDED EXEC 2/1/11 (MILTON M SMITH) PPS TENDER FEE $10 |
|
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
1-28-2011 - Objection CV - DC0917514 - 3251251 OBJECTION TRIAL EXHIBIT (PLT) |
|
January 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
01-21-2011 - Certificate of Deposition CV - DC0917514 - 3194996 CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION BRENDA RHODES |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-16-2010 - Order - Deny - DC Civ M - DC0917514 - 848 - 2998712 ORDER - DENY D/AMD/M/S/J & SUPPLEMENT |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-16-2010 - Jury Demand CV - DC0917514 - 3028207 JURY DEMAND |
|
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-15-2010 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC0917514 - 2985869 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: ORDER DENY AMD & SUPP TO AMD MSJ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.