Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Farah, Manal, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Modjarrad, Sean S., against Choe, Yung Sung, The Randall Law Firm Pc, Lopez, David, Randall, Anthony D, Jones, Sharonda, (total of 7) See All represented by Richmond, Joel A., Randall, Anthony Devries, Jee, Andrew, Choe, Yung Sung, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with SMITH, CRAIG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMITH, CRAIG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCommercial Dispute |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COPY TO P & D |
|
February 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
02-21-2011 - Motion - NonSuit CV - DC0917513 - 3385524 MOTION - NONSUIT JOINT |
|
February 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS TO ADM O/NONSUIT |
|
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-14-2010 - Order - Granting Continuance - DC Civ M - DC0917513 - 1024 - 2980478 ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE |
|
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-14-2010 - Order - Pretrial - DC Civ M - DC0917513 - 1022 - 2980476 ORDER - PRETRIAL |
|
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Non Jury Trial jury fee paid |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-08-2010 - Motion - Continuance CV - DC0917513 - 2967726 MOTION - CONTINUANCE JOINT |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COPY TO PLT |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-01-2010 - Order - Substitute Mediator - DC Civ M - DC0917513 - 833 - 2899456 ORDER - SUBSTITUTE MEDIATOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.