Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gipson, Janet, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Carrigan, Stephen Paul, Manson, Diane S, against Conaster Construction Inc, Jim Bowman Construction Company, L.P.,, T & R Excavation, Inc.,, represented by Ewing, Jerry L, Johnson, Ronald W, Rhine, Bevan A, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOYE', ERIC Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House14th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - QUASH
Date: June 09, 2010ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 16, 2010ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 31, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing | |
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
01-27-2012 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC0917511 - 7017029 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR DISMISSAL RESET - NOTICES MAILED |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing | |
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR DISPOSITION NOTICES MAILED |
|
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
12-15-2011 - Settled - DC Civ P - DC0917511 - 6579547 SETTLED AT MEDIATION |
|
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
11-14-2011 - Certificate of Deposition CV - DC0917511 - 6168866 CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION MITCHELL TALLEY |
|
October 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
10-24-2011 - Certificate of Deposition CV - DC0917511 - 5880848 CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION VICENTE MURILLO |
|
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION AMEND NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE THE ORAL DEPOSITION OF MITCHELL TALLEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.