Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Trophy 315 International Lp, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stewart, George Michael, against Prior Brake Products, Reynolds, Glenn T, represented by Butts, Greg E, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHOFFMAN, MARTIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORDER - DENY
Date: March 10, 2010ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 31, 2009ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF
Date: April 12, 2010ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 12, 2010ORDER - INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT
Date: March 10, 2010ORDER - MISC.
Date: March 10, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference Against PRIOR BRAKES and GLENN REYNOLDS only. Might settle, 30 day EXT from 5/17 |
|
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL 1ST |
|
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
04-12-2010 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC0917502 - 1730565 ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DENY ENTRY DFLT JUDGMT - COPY TO PLTF AND DEFENDENT |
|
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER - INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT AGAINST PRIOR MANUFACTURING - COPY TO PLTF AND DEFENDENT |
|
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER - INTENT TO STRIKE ORDER - MISC. N/INTENT/STRIKE - COPY TO PLTF AND DEFENDENT |
|
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.