Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Boettiger Garrett Hanchin And Maruca Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Tiemann, Stephen W, against United Venture Partners Llc, represented by Paz, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHOFFMAN, MARTIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCommercial Dispute |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 31, 2009ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 25, 2010CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 26, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION NS to 2/28 - Def still does not have an atty - no show - DWOP |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION No show to 1/24 dd, Def has no atty. Neither party showed - Def's failed to retain atty |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
01-26-2011 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC0917473 - 3224744 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION Def atty w/drew and Def is LLC - needs atty |
|
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER - MISC. N/INTENT/STRIKE |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-06-2010 - Order - Withdraw Attorney - DC Civ M - DC0917473 - 959 - 2926820 ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion - Withdraw MOTION TO WD CNSL FILED 10/19/2010 - SET PER JUDGE |
|
November 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
11-24-2010 - Notice of Hearing-Fiat CV - DC0917473 - 2896522 NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT DEF |
|
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
10-19-2010 - Motion - Withdraw Attorney CV - DC0917473 - 2680974 MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Signed 12/6 - Pl atty indicated he would nonsuit. If nothing in by 12/14, will put on DD bc Def is LLC w/o atty |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.