Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kneeland, Joshua, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Stetson, Barrett W, Sylvan, W Coleman, against Childress Custom Canvas Products Inc, represented by Hood, Paul Michael, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with JORDAN, JIM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJORDAN, JIM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORDER - COMPEL
Date: December 19, 2011SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 31, 2010CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 01, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
07-18-2012 - Certificate of Deposition CV - DC0917448 - 9453345 CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION NONAPPEARANCE OF JOSHUA KNEELAND |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil Letter from Mediator announcing settlement received 4/10/12 |
|
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Order of Nonsuit signed 5/14/12 |
|
May 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/NONSUIT - MAILED TO ALL ATTY(S) OF RECORD |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/NONSUIT - SUBMITTED TO JUDGE |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
05-07-2012 - Motion - NonSuit CV - DC0917448 - 8402217 MOTION - NONSUIT |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
04-30-2012 - Settled - DC Civ P - DC0917448 - 8292079 SETTLED @ MEDIATION |
|
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
04-27-2012 - Settled - DC Civ P - DC0917448 - 8285609 SETTLED |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
04-10-2012 - Settled - DC Civ P - DC0917448 - 8025388 SETTLED @ MEDIATION |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
04-10-2012 - Order - Granting Continuance - DC Civ M - DC0917448 - 44 - 8038537 ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE JOINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.