Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Krikie, David, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Boyles, Jim Sheriff, Dallas County Sheriff, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with COX, JOE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOX, JOE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2002 |
CategoryDamages |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2003 | Docket Event | 233.00 ADVTINA | |
June 30, 2003 | Docket Event | SENT TO RECORDS LB | |
June 09, 2003 | Docket Event | SENT JKT TO BILLINGS | |
May 28, 2003 | Docket Event | RET CIT PCT 1 | |
May 08, 2003 | Docket Event | JKT IN 30-DAY DRAWER | |
May 02, 2003 | Docket Event | CIT & COP PCT 1 | |
April 28, 2003 | Docket Event | O/D W P | |
December 30, 2002 | Docket Event | DELETE-LAW LIBRARY F | |
December 30, 2002 | Docket Event | APPELLATE FUND | |
December 30, 2002 | Docket Event | DELETE-MEDIATION FUN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.