Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hasan, Zia, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Newman, Frank M, Jr., against Bhuller, Harcharan, represented by Robbins, Teresa, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with ASHBY, ANNE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeASHBY, ANNE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2002 |
CategoryDamages |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2003 | Docket Event | JKT SENT TO RECS | |
September 29, 2003 | Docket Event | O/NON SUIT | |
September 25, 2003 | Docket Event | M/NON-SUIT | |
September 08, 2003 | Docket Event | M/S/J-H BHULLAR | |
July 17, 2003 | Docket Event | O/MEDIATION | |
March 19, 2003 | Docket Event | NEWMAN AND SUMMERS | |
December 30, 2002 | Docket Event | 7 INST FR TARRANT CO | |
December 30, 2002 | Docket Event | LAW LIBRARY FUND | |
December 30, 2002 | Docket Event | COURT RPT SVC FEE | |
December 30, 2002 | Docket Event | STATE JUDICIAL FEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.