Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Underiters, At Interes, Underwriters, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Carbo, Christine Z, against Autoflex Leasing Dall, Autoflex Leasing-Dall, Autoflex Management Llc, Monarch Service Company, Flex Capital Properties, (total of 5) See All represented by Stoker, Tracy Lynn, Bezney, Paul A., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with PATTERSON, JAY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePATTERSON, JAY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2002 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2004 | Docket Event | SENT TO RECORDS | |
June 18, 2004 | Docket Event | M/DISMISS | |
June 18, 2004 | Docket Event | O/DISMISS | |
June 26, 2003 | Docket Event | O/LEVEL 2 | |
June 25, 2003 | Docket Event | DODGE ANDERSON JONES | |
June 24, 2003 | Docket Event | ENT JURY DEMAND | |
June 24, 2003 | Docket Event | JURY DEMAND | |
May 19, 2003 | Docket Event | O/FOR CONFERENCE | |
March 12, 2003 | Docket Event | CERT DISCOVERY | |
March 06, 2003 | Docket Event | CERT DISCOVERY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.