Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Allodial Limited Partners, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Pikl, James A, against Granite Construction Comp, North Texas Tollway Autho, represented by Fifield, Andrew Tucker, Schumacher, Clint J, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with COX, JOE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOX, JOE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2002 |
CategoryDamages |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT RETURN JKT #5 TO RECORDS |
|
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT SENT JKT #5 TRUST |
|
March 02, 2006 | Docket Event | MANDATE AFFIRM | |
November 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT P/JUDGMT |
|
November 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
OPINION PLTF |
|
February 14, 2005 | Docket Event | JKT 5 TO RECORDS | |
February 10, 2005 | Docket Event | CLERK'S RECORD FEE | |
February 10, 2005 | Docket Event | PREPARATION FEE | |
February 10, 2005 | Docket Event | PREOPARATION FEE | |
February 10, 2005 | Docket Event | SUP CLK'S REC FEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.