Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Texas State Of, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Delagarza, John J, against One Handgun, Madison, Waymon, Three Thousand Five Hundr, represented by Lollar, Nan Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with JUDICIAL, OFFICER DC presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDICIAL, OFFICER DC Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2002 |
CategorySeizure/Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2004 | Docket Event | CITY TREASURER | |
March 29, 2004 | Docket Event | 233.00(043004 DUE | |
March 29, 2004 | Docket Event | BILL-DALLAS P D | |
March 29, 2004 | Docket Event | SENT TO RECORDS LB | |
January 06, 2004 | Docket Event | SENT TO RECORDS | |
December 17, 2003 | Docket Event | O/AGRD JUDGMT | |
October 29, 2003 | Docket Event | N/SUBST CNSL | |
January 27, 2003 | Docket Event | ATTY-LOLLAR NAN D | |
January 27, 2003 | Docket Event | ORIG ANS-WAYMON MAD | |
January 17, 2003 | Docket Event | RET CIT PCT 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.